MD HB1012 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum allowable amount per employee of the income and insurance premium tax credit for a business's cost of providing commuter benefits for its employees from $50 to $100 per individual employee per month; and altering the minimum seating capacity of a vehicle that may be used to provide qualifying commuter benefits for purposes of the income and insurance premium tax credit from eight to six.
Title
Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit Amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {313525/1 Adopted |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {885864/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commuters
Income Tax
Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Transportation - Generally
Commuters
Income Tax
Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Transportation - Generally