MD HB101 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Heat and Eat Program within the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program in the Department of Human Services for the purpose of expanding food access to households that are receiving or eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits; requiring the Department to study the feasibility of establishing automatic eligibility and approval for participation in the Maryland Energy Assistance Program for households receiving or eligible to receive certain benefits under State and federal law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services - Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Heat and Eat Program and Study on Maryland Energy Assistance Program Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2021-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-02-26SenateReferred Finance
2021-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed (117-21)
2021-02-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {964660/1 Adopted
2021-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-02-01HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-10-16HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB913 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services5501(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services5506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback