MD HB101 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the information about a certain measurement of certain gasoline that must be stated on a sign on the premises of a retail service station dealer to require that the highest price, or the cash price and the credit price, be stated in a clear and visible manner; authorizing a certain sign to state the highest price for a certain measurement of certain other motor fuel products; and repealing a certain exemption from a certain signage requirement for certain retail service station dealers.
Title
Gas Price Clarity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB220 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 10 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |