MD HB1007 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring State agencies that are deemed electronic voter registration agencies to implement electronic voter registration systems on or before July 1, 2017; requiring the State Board of Elections to register individuals whose voter registration information is transmitted to the Board through an electronic voter registration system; requiring a public institution of higher education to provide a link to the online voter registration system on the home page of the online portal used by students to register for course work; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freedom to Vote Act

Sponsors

Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Sen. William Smith [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Peter Hammen [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]
Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Michael Vaughn [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2016-04-08 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-36) (Y: 105 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-43) (Y: 93 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kipke) {523224/1 Rejected (49-81) (Y: 49 N: 81 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (105-36)
2016-04-11HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-11SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
2016-04-11SenateFloor Committee Amendment {944633/1 Adopted
2016-04-11SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Waugh) Adopted
2016-04-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {834231/2 Report Adopted
2016-04-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-31SenateHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-22SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (93-43)
2016-03-21HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-21HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {523224/1 Rejected (49-81)
2016-03-21HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2016-03-19HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2016-03-19HouseFloor Committee Amendment {925962/1 Adopted
2016-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {695067/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2016-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1007&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1007f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1007t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1007e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_287_hb1007e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_69506701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_92596201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_52322401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_83423102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_94463301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1007.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1007_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1007_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1007,h-0676&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1007,h-0747&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1007,s-1343&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1007,h-1460&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback