MD HB1007 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the amount of the fee that a condominium council of unit owners may charge a unit owner to furnish a certificate with the information necessary for the unit owner to comply with specified resale disclosure requirements; providing that a council of unit owners is entitled to charge specified fees for an inspection of a unit and for ensuring the completion of specified inspection and preparation and delivery of a specified certificate within 14 days after a written request by a unit owner; etc.
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Norman) Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {188776/1 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {620012/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Condominiums
Disclosure
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Inspections
Liability
Real Estate
Real Property
Condominiums
Disclosure
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Inspections
Liability
Real Estate
Real Property