MD HB1001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to submit a request for a waiver from the federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act to the Legislative Policy Committee of the General Assembly before the Department submits the proposed waiver request to the United States Department of Education and to give the Committee a specified amount of time to review and comment; etc.
Title
Education - Federal Elementary and Secondary Education Act - Waiver Requests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {515962/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Education
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Laws and Ordinances
Legislative Policy Committee
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Education
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Laws and Ordinances
Legislative Policy Committee
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Rules and Regulations