MD HB1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring or authorizing, under certain circumstances, the Maryland Stadium Authority to contract for, manage, and oversee certain public school facility projects; authorizing the Prince George's County government and Board of Education to enter into a certain public-private partnership to enhance the delivery of public school construction projects in the county; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020, to include in the annual budget certain supplemental funding to be used for certain educational purposes; etc.
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20 |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-9) |
2020-03-17 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {394265/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {513726/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {179737/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {179737/1 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-6) |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Walker) Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {294067/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-10-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-08 - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Debt Management
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Examinations
Governor
Investments
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Privatization
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Stadium Authority
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Construction
Contracts
Counties
Debt Management
Economic and Community Development
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Examinations
Governor
Investments
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Privatization
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Stadium Authority
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Economic Development | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 634 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 649 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 658 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 658.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 21 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 126.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 324 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |