MD HB1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from dredging buried oyster shells on Man-O-War Shoals; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-11-16 | House | Pre-filed |