MD HB1 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 91-49)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court, under certain circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; specifying that a termination of parental rights under the Act terminates completely certain rights and the parent's responsibility to support the child, including payment of child support; requiring the court to refer an unrepresented parent to legal services or to appoint counsel; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)

Sponsors

Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Christopher Adams [R]
Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Carl Anderton [R]
Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Steven Arentz [R]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Mary Carozza [R]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Mark Chang [D]
Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R]Del. Jerry Clark [R]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. John Cluster [R]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Paul Corderman [R]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]
Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]Del. William Folden [R]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Robin Grammer [R]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]
Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]
Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Bob Long [R]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Michael Malone [R]
Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Tony McConkey [R]Del. Cory McCray [D]
Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]
Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Warren Miller [R]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]
Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sid Saab [R]
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]
Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]
Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]
Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. David Vogt [R]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Chris West [R]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. William Wivell [R]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4
2018-02-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-01-31HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2018-01-30HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-01-30HouseFavorable with Amendments {852216/1 Report Adopted
2018-01-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-01-18HouseHearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2017-08-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback