MD HB1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Listing cannabimimetic agents on Schedule I for purposes of designating controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; and defining cannabimimetic agents.
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vitale) Rejected (60-76) (Y: 60 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vitale) Rejected (60-76) (Y: 60 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2013-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-20 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (60-76) |
2013-02-20 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2013-02-20 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {633626/1 |
2013-02-19 | House | Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {432312/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2012-09-04 | House | Pre-filed |