MA S786 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-24 - Read; and referred to Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent farm animal cruelty. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent farm animal cruelty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-24SenateRead; and referred to Senate Ways and Means
2012-07-24SenateMotion to substitute bill for the report of the committee prevailed
2012-07-24SenateRules suspended
2012-07-24SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2012-06-27HouseHouse concurred
2012-06-27HouseRules suspended
2012-06-21SenateReporting date extended to Friday, July 13, 2012
2012-06-21SenateRules suspended
2012-05-14HouseHouse concurred
2012-05-03SenateReporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012
2012-05-03SenateRules suspended
2012-04-09HouseHouse concurred
2012-03-29SenateReporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012
2012-03-29SenateRules suspended
2011-09-29JointHearing scheduled for 10/05/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2011-01-24HouseHouse concurred
2011-01-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback