MA H614 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to administering national standards to Medicaid medical necessity reviews. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to administering national standards to Medicaid medical necessity reviews

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S336 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Senate concurred
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S639 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Senate concurred
H615 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence
H342 (Similar To) 2017-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H602 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback