MA H2529 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to impose an excise tax on distributors sugary drinks and promoting healthy alternatives to such drinks. Revenue.
Title
To promote healthy alternatives to sugary drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S121 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H2605 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2603 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2599 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2605 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2603 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H2599 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1727 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2529 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2529.pdf |