MA H2226 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4722

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the hiring preferences for veterans and surviving children of police officers and fire fighters who died in the line of duty. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting veterans and children of those officers and firefighters that gave their last full measure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-20HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4722
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2367 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2276 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2361 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H2037 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
S1596 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1588 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H2380
S1569 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1571 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback