LA SR96 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/21/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/21/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Carl W. Aron on fifty years of service to the Louisiana Board of Pharmacy.
Title
Commends Carl W. Aron on fifty years of service to the Louisiana Board of Pharmacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/21/2021. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |