LA SR89 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the condolences of the Louisiana Senate upon the death of U.S. Marine Corps Lance Corporal Evan Burnett.
Title
Expresses the condolences of the Louisiana Senate upon the death of U.S. Marine Corps Lance Corporal Evan Burnett.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |