LA SR89 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the St. Tammany Parish Inspector General Task Force to study the feasibility of creating an office of inspector general for St. Tammany Parish.
Title
Establishes the St. Tammany Parish Inspector General Task Force to study the feasibility of creating an office of inspector general for St. Tammany Parish.
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |