LA SR87 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to enact policies relative to children giving birth.
Title
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to enact policies relative to children giving birth.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |