LA SR60 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends condolences on the death of U.S. Navy Aircrewman Joseph Patrick Fitzmorris in Oman.
Title
Extends condolences on the death of U.S. Navy Aircrewman Joseph Patrick Fitzmorris in Oman.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |