LA SR53 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the office of community development to follow certain recommendations of the legislative auditor and the Department of Housing and Urban Development, office of inspector general.
Title
Directs the office of community development to follow certain recommendations of the legislative auditor and the Department of Housing and Urban Development, office of inspector general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |