LA SR53 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-28 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-28 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Moonbot Studios on winning the Oscar for Best Animated Short Film at the 84th Annual Academy Awards.
Title
Commends Moonbot Studios on winning the Oscar for Best Animated Short Film at the 84th Annual Academy Awards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-28 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title and adopted. | |
2012-05-22 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-04-16 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-12 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |