LA SR4 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on February 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/11/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on February 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/11/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere condolences upon the death of former Louisiana State Senator Sydney Banks Nelson.
Title
Expresses sincere condolences upon the death of former Louisiana State Senator Sydney Banks Nelson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 4 CO-AUTHORS (#15) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/11/2022. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |