LA SR26 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Commissioner of Insurance to report to the Senate to the extent any reductions to automobile insurance rates have been realized.
Title
Requests the Commissioner of Insurance to report to the Senate to the extent any reductions to automobile insurance rates have been realized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |