LA SR26 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Delta Sigma Theta Sorority for 100 years of service and recognizes Wednesday, April 17, 2013, as the twenty-ninth annual "Red and White" Day.
Title
Commends Delta Sigma Theta Sorority for 100 years of service and recognizes Wednesday, April 17, 2013, as the twenty-ninth annual "Red and White" Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |