LA SR23 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Prevention of Human Degradation and Exploitation of Vulnerable Individuals in Community-Based Residential Settings.
Title
Creates the Task Force on Prevention of Human Degradation and Exploitation of Vulnerable Individuals in Community-Based Residential Settings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |