LA SR220 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and commends the Louisiana teams that participated in the 2018 FIRST Robotics World Championship in Houston, Texas.
Title
Recognizes and commends the Louisiana teams that participated in the 2018 FIRST Robotics World Championship in Houston, Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |