LA SR211 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, June 4, 2019, as Girl Scouts of the United States of America Day at the capitol and to recognize the one hundred-seventh anniversary of the founding of Girl Scouting.
Title
Designates Tuesday, June 4, 2019, as Girl Scouts of the United States of America Day at the capitol and to recognize the one hundred-seventh anniversary of the founding of Girl Scouting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |