LA SR21 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association members for their work on behalf of Louisiana athletes and designates March 27, 2024, as Louisiana Athletic Trainers Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Commends Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association members for their work on behalf of Louisiana athletes and designates March 27, 2024, as Louisiana Athletic Trainers Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |