LA SR21 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Cameron Doyle for being selected to represent Louisiana at the 2018 Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Program World Leadership Congress.
Title
Commends Cameron Doyle for being selected to represent Louisiana at the 2018 Hugh O'Brian Youth Leadership Program World Leadership Congress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018. |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |