LA SR21 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Kingston Elementary School on winning the Elementary National Championship in the National Archery in Schools Program and finishing fourth in the NASP/IBO 3-D competition.
Title
Commends Kingston Elementary School on winning the Elementary National Championship in the National Archery in Schools Program and finishing fourth in the NASP/IBO 3-D competition.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |