LA SR21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Brown Builders, Inc. of Bossier City upon receipt of the titles of 2014 Builder of the Year and 2014 North American Volume Builder of the Year awarded by Butler Manufacturing.
Title
Commends Brown Builders, Inc. of Bossier City upon receipt of the titles of 2014 Builder of the Year and 2014 North American Volume Builder of the Year awarded by Butler Manufacturing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |