LA SR200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Thursday, June 6, 2013, as Zeta Phi Beta Day at the state capitol and commends the members of Zeta Phi Beta Sorority, Inc.
Title
Recognizes Thursday, June 6, 2013, as Zeta Phi Beta Day at the state capitol and commends the members of Zeta Phi Beta Sorority, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |