LA SR196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Board of Regents and the state Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to include computer coding and American Sign Language as course equivalents for TOPS core curriculum and high school graduation requirements.
Title
Urges and requests the Board of Regents and the state Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to include computer coding and American Sign Language as course equivalents for TOPS core curriculum and high school graduation requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |