LA SR161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Kenneth Joseph Cochran, CEO of Opelousas General Health System upon being recognized by the National Rural Health Association, American Hospital Association, and HIMSS.
Title
Commends Kenneth Joseph Cochran, CEO of Opelousas General Health System upon being recognized by the National Rural Health Association, American Hospital Association, and HIMSS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |