LA SR145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Leroy "Slick" Seal on sixty years of devoted public service as a law enforcement official serving the people of Washington Parish and recognizes Monday, Sept. 2, 2013, as Leroy "Slick" Seal Day.
Title
Commends Leroy "Slick" Seal on sixty years of devoted public service as a law enforcement official serving the people of Washington Parish and recognizes Monday, Sept. 2, 2013, as Leroy "Slick" Seal Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |