LA SR136 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 30th as University of New Orleans Day at the state capitol.
Title
Recognizes May 30th as University of New Orleans Day at the state capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |