LA SR133 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Desire "Peanut" Alleman Jr. on receiving the James O. Modisette Award for Outstanding Louisiana Public Library Trustee for 2016.
Title
Commends Desire "Peanut" Alleman Jr. on receiving the James O. Modisette Award for Outstanding Louisiana Public Library Trustee for 2016.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |