LA SR121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the legislative auditor to review certain crime statistics for the city of New Orleans.
Title
Requests the legislative auditor to review certain crime statistics for the city of New Orleans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |