LA SR111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Tulane University on its decision to retire No.18 in all sports in honor of Devon Walker.
Title
Commends Tulane University on its decision to retire No.18 in all sports in honor of Devon Walker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |