LA SR100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Monday, April 16, 2018, as DASH Diet Day.
Title
Recognizes Monday, April 16, 2018, as DASH Diet Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |