LA SR1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the annual integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2018.
Title
Approves the annual integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] | Sen. John Alario [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |