LA SCR99 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Domestic Violence Prevention Commission to study the long-term effects of domestic violence.
Title
Requests the Domestic Violence Prevention Commission to study the long-term effects of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#864) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 99 ADOPT (#460) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 99 ADOPT (#460) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |