LA SCR99 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Kaplan High School Lady Pirates softball team for winning the LHSAA Class 3A championship title.
Title
Commends the Kaplan High School Lady Pirates softball team for winning the LHSAA Class 3A championship title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 99 ADOPT (#650) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016. |
2016-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |