LA SCR96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Revenue Estimating Conference to consider including all dedicated funds and fees and self-generated revenues in the projection of money available for appropriation in the long-range forecast.
Title
Urges and requests the Revenue Estimating Conference to consider including all dedicated funds and fees and self-generated revenues in the projection of money available for appropriation in the long-range forecast.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 96 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#855) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 96 ADOPT (#423) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 96 ADOPT (#423) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |