LA SCR95 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority and the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to develop a proposal seeking Open Ocean TIG and RW TIG funds to monitor red snapper and other reef fish impacted by the Deepwater Horizon oil spill.
Title
Requests the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority and the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to develop a proposal seeking Open Ocean TIG and RW TIG funds to monitor red snapper and other reef fish impacted by the Deepwater Horizon oil spill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 95 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1251) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 95 ADOPT (#834) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 95 ADOPT (#834) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 87 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |