LA SCR93 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends local school board members and local school superintendents for their service and dedication to the education of our children and for the pivotal role they play in producing excellent public education.
Title
Commends local school board members and local school superintendents for their service and dedication to the education of our children and for the pivotal role they play in producing excellent public education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 93 CO-AUTHORS (#298) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 93 ADOPT (#297) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 93 ADOPT (#297) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-05-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-05-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |