LA SCR92 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the state Department of Education to report to the legislature regarding implementation of the recommendations made in the Alternative Education Study Group Report.
Title
Requests the state Department of Education to report to the legislature regarding implementation of the recommendations made in the Alternative Education Study Group Report.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 92 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1254) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 92 ADOPT (#833) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 92 ADOPT (#833) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 84 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |