LA SCR9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2022, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Title
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2022, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 9 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#941) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 9 ADOPT (#228) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 9 ADOPT (#228) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (7-1). |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |