LA SCR9 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-10)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-10)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 2020 as Colorectal Cancer Awareness month in Louisiana and commends Mary Bird Perkins - Our Lady of the Lake Cancer Center on the achievement of attaining the designation of National Accreditation Program for Rectal Cancer.
Title
Designates March 2020 as Colorectal Cancer Awareness month in Louisiana and commends Mary Bird Perkins - Our Lady of the Lake Cancer Center on the achievement of attaining the designation of National Accreditation Program for Rectal Cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 9 CO-AUTHORS (#18) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 9 ADOPT (#17) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 9 ADOPT (#17) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-03-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-03-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |