LA SCR89 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To recognize, honor, and declare June 25, 2011, as "New Orleans Alumnae Chapter Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Incorporated Day" in celebration of the 75 years of sisterhood and service in the city of New Orleans and whose legacy is "Community Service from the Heart".
Title
To recognize, honor, and declare June 25, 2011, as "New Orleans Alumnae Chapter Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Incorporated Day" in celebration of the 75 years of sisterhood and service in the city of New Orleans and whose legacy is "Community Service from the Heart".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 89, SCR 89 BY MURRAY (#744) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-06-20 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |